ND SB2112 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 57-39.4-19 and sections 57-39.4-29 and 57-39.4-33.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to uniform tax returns, the taxability matrix, and tax administration practices under the sales and use tax agreement.
Title
Uniform tax returns, the taxability matrix, and tax administration practices under the sales and use tax agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 57 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 57 nays 33 |
2017-03-03 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-03-02 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 45 |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |