ND SB2106 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 37-17.3-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state radio fee system.
Title
The state radio fee system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-01-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |