ND SB2102 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subdivision n of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and sections 19-24.1-01 and 23-01-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fingerprint-based criminal history record checks for the department of health and human services, and compassion centers.
Title
Fingerprint-based criminal history record checks for the department of health and human services, and compassion centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6 |
2023-03-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-01-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |