ND SB2102 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 26.1-53.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to discount plans; and to repeal chapter 26.1-53 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to discount medical plans.
Title
Discount medical plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2019-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Kasper Louser P. Anderson |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Kreun Vedaa Piepkorn |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 6 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |