ND SB2089 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 23-34-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical peer reviews.
Title
Medical peer reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |