ND SB2053 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 39-03.1-11.2, section 54-52-01, subsections 3 and 4 of section 54-52-17, subsection 4 of section 54-52-28, section 54-52.1-03, subsection 1 of section 54-52.1-03.3, section 54-52.1-03.4, subsection 2 of section 54-52.1-18, section 54-52.6-06, and subsection 2 of section 54-52.6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definitions of retirement and retirement board, eligibility for disability retirement and early retirement benefits under the public employees retirement system, employee enrollment, billing for the retiree health insurance credit, temporary employee participation in the uniform group insurance program failure to maintain a health savings account when the high-deductible health plan is elected, payment of administrative expenses of the defined contribution plan, penalties for employers failing to pay contributions under the defined contribution plan, to provide a contingent effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The definitions of retirement and retirement board, eligibility for disability retirement and early retirement benefits under the public employees retirement system, employee enrollment, billing for the retiree health insurance credit, temporary employee participation in the uniform group insurance program failure to maintain a health savings account when the high-deductible health plan is elected, payment of administrative expenses of the defined contribution plan, penalties for employers failing to pay contributions under the defined contribution plan, to provide a contingent effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |