ND SB2051 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 53-06.2-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to distributions from the breeders' fund.
Title
Distributions from the breeders' fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 10 |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |