ND SB2041 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 21-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the issuance of bonds by the governing body of a park district without voter approval.
Title
The issuance of bonds by the governing body of a park district without voter approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 72 nays 13 |
2019-04-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Political Subdivisions |
2019-03-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |