ND SB2024 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 23-12-10.4, subsection 2 of section 54-27-25, and subsection 1 of section 54-59-22.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to smoking prohibited signage, the tobacco settlement trust fund, and required use of centralized desktop support services; to repeal chapter 23-42 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the tobacco prevention and control program; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The tobacco prevention and control program; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 29, Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 16 4 1 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 36 nays 10, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |