ND HCR3014 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the Southwest Power Pool and Midcontinent Independent System Operator to take prompt and decisive actions to maintain the reliability of the Bulk Power System by correcting market failures that have allowed capacity retirements to outpace replacement.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the Southwest Power Pool and Midcontinent Independent System Operator to take prompt and decisive actions to maintain the reliability of the Bulk Power System by correcting market failures that have allowed capacity retirements to outpace replacement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18 |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:33 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-15 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 11:25 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |