ND HB1536 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 15-10-17 and section 15-10-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legislative authority to set tuition and fees at institutions under the control of the state board of higher education.
Title
Legislative authority to set tuition and fees at institutions under the control of the state board of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Rep. Luke Simons [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 27 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 62 |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |