ND HB1529 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study relating to campaign finance.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 0 2 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |