ND HB1463 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 14-02.4-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reasonable accommodations in the workplace for pregnancy.
Title
Reasonable accommodations in the workplace for pregnancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | Signed by Governor 04/06 |
2015-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2015-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |