ND HB1463 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a school district critical needs construction and renovation grant.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a school district critical needs construction and renovation grant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 88 | |
2011-02-08 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 15 0 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Committee Hearing 02:45 | |
2011-01-26 | Request return from committee | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1463.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0668-02000.pdf |