ND HB1431 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting the use of certain brakes at certain locations.
Title
Prohibiting the use of certain brakes at certain locations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Gruchalla [D] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
Sen. George Sinner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 79 |
2013-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |