ND HB1412 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Taylor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-40.6-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the fee imposed for emergency services communications; to provide for a legislative council study; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Taylor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-40.6-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the fee imposed for emergency services communications; to provide for a legislative council study; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 044 nays 002 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 066 nays 023 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Cook Miller Anderson | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Headland Kretschmar J. Kelsh | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-03 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-03 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-04-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 057 nays 037 | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 001 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1412.html |