ND HB1394 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a highway logo sign program.
Title
A highway logo sign program.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Rep. Landon Bahl [R] | Rep. Dori Hauck [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Andrew Marschall [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Sen. Jay Elkin [R] | Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] |
Sen. Dean Rummel [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 2 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 92 |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |