ND HB1390 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of liability for application of pesticides.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of liability for application of pesticides.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] |
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87 |
2013-02-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 1 2 |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1390.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0420-02000.pdf |