ND HB1379 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to adoption and referral of preliminary budgets of cities, counties, school districts, and park districts; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Adoption and referral of preliminary budgets of cities, counties, school districts, and park districts; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] |
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 52 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |