ND HB1379 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 062
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 062
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Warner A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce to fund a feasibility study for the construction of a marina and to the game and fish department to construct a paved roadway and boat ramp.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Warner A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce to fund a feasibility study for the construction of a marina and to the game and fish department to construct a paved roadway and boat ramp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-10 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 031 nays 062 | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-23 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1379.html |