ND HB1376 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales tax exemption for sales of used clothing by a thrift store of a nonprofit corporation; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A sales tax exemption for sales of used clothing by a thrift store of a nonprofit corporation; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76 |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |