ND HB1349 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 1 of section 57-38-01.3 and a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a deduction for pipeline leak detection equipment depreciation expenses; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A deduction for pipeline leak detection equipment depreciation expenses; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 80 |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 3 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |