ND HB1335 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 26.1-39-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property and casualty insurance covered loss.
Title
Property and casualty insurance covered loss.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Schobinger [R] | Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 93 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |