ND HB1315 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Division B lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Division B lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision i of subsection 1 of section 39-09-02 and section 39-09-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to speed limitations on multilane highways and minimum speed limits; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Speed limitations on multilane highways and minimum speed limits; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Division B lost |
2021-02-16 | House | Division A lost |
2021-02-16 | House | Division of bill |
2021-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |