ND HB1306 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to establishing a dyslexia voucher program; to provide a report to the legislative management; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Establishing a dyslexia voucher program; to provide a report to the legislative management; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Sen. Kyle Davison [R] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Kent Weston [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 3 |
2023-02-16 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 04:06 |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |