ND HB1204 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 16.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring a candidate for the legislative district office of state representative to designate for which position the candidate is running; and to amend and reenact section 16.1-11-10 and subsection 2 of section 16.1-11-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to placing an applicant's name on the ballot and the order of offices on the ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Placing an applicant's name on the ballot and the order of offices on the ballot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 9 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-13HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 81
2023-02-10HouseLaid over one legislative day
2023-02-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 4 2
2023-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 08:50
2023-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2023-01-11HouseRereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs
2023-01-11HouseRequest return from committee
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback