ND HB1204 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-01.5 and subdivision? a of subsection? 1 of section 20.1-03-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to youth hunting; and to repeal section 20.1-04-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the protection of bald eagles.
Title
The protection of bald eagles.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Bill Oliver [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor 04/14 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 2 |
2017-04-07 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Unruh Kreun Oban |
2017-03-31 | House | Conference committee appointed Roers Jones Heinert Lefor |
2017-03-31 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 2 |
2017-01-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |