ND HB1182 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on increases in property assessments for property tax purposes; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Limitations on increases in property assessments for property tax purposes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Daniel Johnston [R] |
Rep. Vernon Laning [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 61 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |