ND HB1180 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring reasonable suspicion for certain traffic stops.
Title
Requiring reasonable suspicion for certain traffic stops.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 41 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Motion to reconsider failed |
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 46 |
2017-01-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 4 3 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |