ND HB1171 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15-10-18.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extending the benefits of free tuition at state institutions of higher education to a stepchild of a peace officer killed in the line of duty.
Title
Extending the benefits of free tuition at state institutions of higher education to a stepchild of a peace officer killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |