ND HB1137 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 65-04-26.2 and 65-04-27.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation requirements for general contractors and cease and desist orders; to amend and reenact subsection 16 of section 65-01-02 and section 65-04-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workers' compensation definition of employee, assignment of rate classification, and calculation of premium; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The workers' compensation definition of employee, assignment of rate classification, and calculation of premium; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2017-01-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |