ND HB1113 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 14-09-06.3 and 14-09-06.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to parenting investigators and guardians ad litem.
Title
Parenting investigators and guardians ad litem.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28 |
2023-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2023-03-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2023-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 11:13 |
2023-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |