ND HB1111 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to international health regulations.
Title
International health regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10 |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Governor 04/06 |
2023-04-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2023-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 3 2 1 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:05 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 12 |
2023-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:28 |
2023-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |