ND HB1075 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the various divisions under the supervision of the director of the office of management and budget; to provide for various transfers; to amend and reenact subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 54-27-25, subsection 1 of section 57-51-15, and section 57-51.1-07.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oil and gas allocations; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Oil and gas allocations; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 19 0 2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |