ND HB1073 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of public instruction, the state library, the school for the deaf, and the North Dakota vision services? - school for the blind; to create and enact a new section to chapter 25-06 and a new section to chapter 25-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the school for the blind fund and the school for the deaf fund; to amend and reenact section 15.1-02-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the superintendent of public instruction; and to provide for a transfer.
Title
The salary of the superintendent of public instruction; and to provide for a transfer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 19 0 2 |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |