ND HB1068 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to repeal sections 27-04-01, 27-04-03, 27-04-04, 27-04-06, 27-04-07, and 27-04-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to appointment of the supreme court reporter, the salary of the supreme court reporter, the location of the office of the supreme court reporter, duties of the supreme court reporter, and the sale and disposal of books and other library materials by the supreme court reporter.
Title
Appointment of the supreme court reporter, the salary of the supreme court reporter, the location of the office of the supreme court reporter, duties of the supreme court reporter, and the sale and disposal of books and other library materials by the supreme court reporter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor 03/06 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-01-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |