ND HB1065 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state treasurer; and to amend and reenact sections 54-11-13 and 57-62-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the state treasurer and coal severance tax.
Title
The salary of the state treasurer and coal severance tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 88 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 19 0 2 |
2017-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |