ND HB1040 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 54-52-02.15, 54-52.2-09, 54-52.6-02.1, 54-52.6-02.2, 54-52.6-05.1, 54-52.6-09.5, 54-52.6-09.6, 54-52.6-22, and 54-52.6-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the closure of the public employees retirement system main plan, the deferred compensation program, and expansion of the defined contribution retirement plan; to amend and reenact paragraph 1 of subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 15-39.1-10.3, sections 54-52-01, 54-52-02.5, 54-52-02.9, 54-52-02.11, and 54-52-02.12, subsection 2 of section 54-52-05, sections 54-52-06 and 54-52-14.3, subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 54-52-17.2, and sections 54-52.6-01, 54-52.6-02, 54-52.6-03, 54-52.6-05, 54-52.6-08, 54-52.6-09, 54-52.6-10, 54-52.6-13, 54-52.6-15, 54-52.6-19, and 57-51.1-07.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the public employees retirement system defined benefit and defined contribution retirement plans and the state share of oil and gas taxes; to repeal sections 54-52-06.5 and 54-52.6-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system retirement plan contribution rates upon reaching full funding and balance transfer when opting to participate in the defined contribution plan; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a transfer; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Public employees retirement system retirement plan contribution rates upon reaching full funding and balance transfer when opting to participate in the defined contribution plan; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a transfer; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01 |
2023-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2023-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 17 |
2023-04-25 | House | Concurred |
2023-04-24 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 28 nays 19 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 6 1 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 29 nays 18 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported back without recommendation 6 0 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:52 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 16 |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | Laid over two legislative days |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 9 1 |
2023-02-17 | House | Committee Hearing 08:15 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 07:00 |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee Hearing 05:00 |
2023-02-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted |
2023-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Government and Veterans Affairs |