ND HB1025 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact title 4.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agriculture; to amend and reenact sections 4-13.2-03, 36-04-10, 36-04-10.1, and 36-05-13.2 and subsection 1 of section 54-07-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agricultural commodity boards and commissions; to repeal chapters 4-10.1, 4-10.2, 4-10.3, 4-10.4, 4-10.5, 4-10.6, 4-10.7, 4-12.1, 4-13.1, 4-27, 4-28, and 4-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota potato council and assessment, the North Dakota oilseed council and assessment, the North Dakota dry bean council and assessment, the North Dakota barley council and assessment, the North Dakota soybean council and assessment, the North Dakota corn utilization council and assessment, the North Dakota dry pea and lentil council and assessment, the North Dakota honey assessment, the North Dakota turkey assessment, the North Dakota dairy promotion commission and assessment, the North Dakota wheat commission and assessment, and the North Dakota beef commission and assessment; to provide a penalty; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact title 4.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agriculture; to amend and reenact sections 4-13.2-03, 36-04-10, 36-04-10.1, and 36-05-13.2 and subsection 1 of section 54-07-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agricultural commodity boards and commissions; to repeal chapters 4-10.1, 4-10.2, 4-10.3, 4-10.4, 4-10.5, 4-10.6, 4-10.7, 4-12.1, 4-13.1, 4-27, 4-28, and 4-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota potato council and assessment, the North Dakota oilseed council and assessment, the North Dakota dry bean council and assessment, the North Dakota barley council and assessment, the North Dakota soybean council and assessment, the North Dakota corn utilization council and assessment, the North Dakota dry pea and lentil council and assessment, the North Dakota honey assessment, the North Dakota turkey assessment, the North Dakota dairy promotion commission and assessment, the North Dakota wheat commission and assessment, and the North Dakota beef commission and assessment; to provide a penalty; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-16 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-01-22 | Received from House | |
2009-01-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 001 | |
2009-01-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-08 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1025.html |