ND SB2329 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 041 nays 052
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 041 nays 052
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Karls, Martinson, Mueller A BILL for an Act to provide for an appropriation to the industrial commission for creating geographic information system-based maps or overlays; and to provide an appropriation to the state historical society for the purpose of coordinating the mapping project.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Karls, Martinson, Mueller A BILL for an Act to provide for an appropriation to the industrial commission for creating geographic information system-based maps or overlays; and to provide an appropriation to the state historical society for the purpose of coordinating the mapping project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 041 nays 052 | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 006 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-18 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 004 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-06 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-30 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2329.html |