ND SB2245 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the agriculture commissioner for an intermodal facility grant program; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the agriculture commissioner for an intermodal facility grant program; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Rep. Jay Fisher [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 6 |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Appoint Rep. D. Johnson to replace Rep. Kempenich on conference committee |
2021-04-27 | House | New conference committee appointed J. Nelson Kempenich Brandenburg |
2021-04-27 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Conference committee appointed J. Nelson Kempenich Brandenburg |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Davison Rust |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-07 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 7 |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 1 2 |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |