ND SB2229 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-06-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to making up instructional time if school is canceled due to a no travel advisory.
Title
Making up instructional time if school is canceled due to a no travel advisory.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |