ND SB2221 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 47-18-01, subsection 4 of section 47-18-04, and section 47-18-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the homestead exemption, when the homestead is subject to exemption, and exempt proceeds of sale.
Title
The homestead exemption, when the homestead is subject to exemption, and exempt proceeds of sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] |
Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63 |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |