ND SB2209 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-33.2-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to allocation of wind generation tax revenue.
Title
Allocation of wind generation tax revenue.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Rep. Randy Boehning [R] |
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, without recommendation 5 1 0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |