ND SB2201 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring the state to observe daylight saving time year round; to repeal section 40-01-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to daylight saving time; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
Daylight saving time; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Heitkamp [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] |
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67 |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 2 2 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 36 nays 11 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 23 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |