ND 2189 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee Hearing 09:30
Pending: Joint Finance and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-36-01, 57-36-02, 57-36-04, 57-36-05, 57-36-09, 57-36-09.1, and 57-36-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing requirements for electronic smoking device dealers and distributors; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing requirements for electronic smoking device dealers and distributors; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-09HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 8
2021-02-05SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-04SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback