ND SB2177 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 39-06.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to temporary restricted licenses.
Title
Temporary restricted licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |