ND SB2032 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 10 of section 4-05.1-19, section 54-59-19, and subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reporting requirements for the state board of agricultural research and education, reporting requirements for the information technology department, and individual, estate, and trust income tax credits; and to repeal section 54-23.3-09, chapter 54-56, and sections 57-38-01.29 and 57-38-01.30, relating to reporting of new department of corrections and rehabilitation programs, the children's services coordinating committee, the homestead income tax credit, and the commercial property income tax credit.
Title
Reporting of new department of corrections and rehabilitation programs, the children's services coordinating committee, the homestead income tax credit, and the commercial property income tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |