ND SB2028 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to repeal sections 15.1-02-20, 15.1-03-03, 15.1-06-18, 15.1-21-02.7, 15.1-21-06, and 15.1-21-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to education stabilization fund usage, the revolving printing fund, school reports, scholarships for 2009-10 high school graduates, district participation in the Goals 2000 Educate America Act, and a report on the use of state funds for professional development.
Title
Education stabilization fund usage, the revolving printing fund, school reports, scholarships for 2009-10 high school graduates, district participation in the Goals 2000 Educate America Act, and a report on the use of state funds for professional development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-01-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |