ND HB1498 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 43-15-01 and section 43-15-31.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pharmacist administration of drugs.
Title
Pharmacist administration of drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2019-03-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-08 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |